+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 496
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4744
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- File Number 45
- Senate Calendar Number 88
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/16 5:00 PM
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/23
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Vote
April 27, 2016: Senate Roll Call Vote 208
- Yeas: 36