+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-75
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Passed Temporary
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 616
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 714
- Senate Calendar Number 532
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/13 10:00 AM
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/22
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 252
- Yeas: 130
- Absent: 20
May 15, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 281 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (13)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor