+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-35
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 810
- Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6038
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 372
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5697
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 178
- Senate Calendar Number 185
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/28
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On January 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 15, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 289 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A, HO
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 3
May 9, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 140 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 135
- Absent: 15
April 18, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 98 PASS AS AMENDED BY A
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (15)
Housing Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor