+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-74
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 614
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 567
- Senate Calendar Number 406
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/20
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 259
- Yeas: 132
- Absent: 18
May 15, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 308 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (10)
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor