+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Special Act 19-3
On June 1, 2019 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed
- Rules Suspended
- House Calendar Number 702
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 952
- Senate Calendar Number 568
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/21/19 5:00 PM
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 04/29
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Sponsor
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor