+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- File Number 745
- Senate Calendar Number 508
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/26/21 5:00 PM
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 05/14
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Sponsor
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor