+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-91
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 830
- Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6724
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 371
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 431
- Senate Calendar Number 306
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/11
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On January 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 30, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 400 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
May 15, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 171 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 129
- Absent: 21
April 18, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 146
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (18)
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor