+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Act 15-220
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 638
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6710
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on General Law
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 653
- Senate Calendar Number 377
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/15 5:00 PM
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
- Public Hearing 02/20
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2015: House Roll Call Vote 302 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 134
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 9
May 22, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 275
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor