+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Act 15-227
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 636
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7974
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 620
- Senate Calendar Number 334
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/15 10:00 AM
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/19
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Education
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 2, 2015: House Roll Call Vote 316 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 144
- Absent: 7
May 22, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 270
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsor
Education Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor