+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- File Number 608
- Senate Calendar Number 436
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 12:00 PM
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/30
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
+ − Sponsor
REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR PURSUANT TO JOINT RULE 9
Type:
Primary Sponsor