+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 1, 2019 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 699
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9869
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 738
- Senate Calendar Number 339
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/25
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor