+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-220
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8513
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 8619
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 8608
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 683
- Rules Suspended
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
- In Concurrence
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 319
- Senate Calendar Number 244
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 5:00 PM
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/18
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (5)
June 3, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 357 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 131
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 4
June 3, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 514 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 8513
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
June 3, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 515 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 8619
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
June 3, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 516 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 8608
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 2
June 3, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 517 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A,B
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (8)
Public Safety Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor