+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 349
- Senate Calendar Number 259
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/12
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor