+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/12
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
+ − Sponsors (3)
Human Services Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor