+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted to Environment
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 493
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 365
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/22
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor