+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 752
- Senate Calendar Number 443
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/27/15 5:00 PM
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/18
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
+ − Sponsor
Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor