+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 605
- Senate Calendar Number 296
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/20
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor