+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-265
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 612
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 526
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- File Number 712
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/13 10:00 AM
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/12
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 6, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 424 CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 146
- Absent: 4
May 15, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 296 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (16)
Commerce Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor