+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 643
- Senate Calendar Number 314
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/18
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor