+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On July 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Act 21-196
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10261
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- In Concurrence
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 545
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9002
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 317
- File Number 536
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 5:00 PM
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/29
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor