+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-157
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 593
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 542
- Senate Calendar Number 399
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/13 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/20
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 325
- Yeas: 136
- Absent: 14
May 14, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 278 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (17)
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor