+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- File Number 746
- Senate Calendar Number 427
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/09/17 5:00 PM
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 04/25
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
April 27, 2017: FIN Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 23
+ − Sponsor
Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor