+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Special Act 13-8
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 560
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 564
- Senate Calendar Number 413
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/13 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/11
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 254
- Yeas: 135
- Absent: 15
May 8, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 221 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (16)
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor