+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted to Planning and Development
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 764
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/04/15 5:00 PM
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 555
- Senate Calendar Number 326
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/11
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor