+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted to Labor and Public Employees
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 273
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 210
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/03
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Sponsor
Labor and Public Employees Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor