+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 200
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 189
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/07
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor