+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-84
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 559
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6154
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 199
- Senate Calendar Number 188
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/07
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 264 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 138
- Absent: 12
May 8, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 212 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (51)
Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor