+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Act 19-22
On June 1, 2019 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 556
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7971
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 236
- Senate Calendar Number 107
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/12
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Commerce Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor