+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Special Act 13-7
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 590
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 5874
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 198
- Senate Calendar Number 184
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/05
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 21, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 232
- Yeas: 134
- Absent: 16
May 14, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 241 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 5874
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 22
May 14, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 247 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (14)
Human Services Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor