+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 261
- Senate Calendar Number 143
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 10:00 AM
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/12
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Commerce Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor