+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 271
- Senate Calendar Number 194
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/03
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Amendments (18)
+ − Sponsor
Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor