+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Act 17-205
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 571
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 7667
- Senate Passed
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- File Number 697
- Senate Calendar Number 385
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/17 10:00 AM
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/20
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 4, 2017: JUD Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 40
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor