+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Act 19-100
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 545
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 380
- Senate Calendar Number 185
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/13
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Education
+ − Sponsor
Education Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor