+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-83
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,C
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule C 6959
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 610
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Reconsidered
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 6935
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule C 6959
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,C
- On Consent Calendar
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Matter Pass Retained
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 6935
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6258
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 443
- Senate Calendar Number 303
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/08
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 271 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 135
- Absent: 15
May 15, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 292 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (9)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor