+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-82
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 620
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7172
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on General Law
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 442
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 302
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/15
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 261 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 130
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 17
May 16, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 331 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (30)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor