+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Act 17-68
On June 2, 2017 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Rules Suspended
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 615
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7652
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- File Number 569
- Senate Calendar Number 303
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/17 5:00 PM
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/20
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Education
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 8, 2017: APP Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 6
March 24, 2017: ED Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Education Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor