+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- Special Act 13-9
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 608
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 346
- Senate Calendar Number 254
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/08
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 28, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 288
- Yeas: 143
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 4
May 15, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 303 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (21)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor