+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 19, 2022 in the House:
- Special Act 22-24
On May 4, 2022 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On April 21, 2022 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 419
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- File Number 307
- Senate Calendar Number 226
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 5:00 PM
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/22
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Sponsor
Commerce Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor