+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-279
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- On Consent Calendar
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 388
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5799
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 157
- Senate Calendar Number 157
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/07
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
June 6, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 424 CONSENT CALENDAR
- Yeas: 146
- Absent: 4
April 18, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 135
- Yeas: 36