+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-56
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 387
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5888
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 156
- Senate Calendar Number 156
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/07
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 198 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 136
- Absent: 14
April 18, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 134
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (24)
Commerce Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor