+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act 13-160
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 587
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on General Law
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 388
- Senate Calendar Number 269
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/18
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 319
- Yeas: 140
- Absent: 10
May 14, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 274 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (9)
Public Safety Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor