+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Matter Pass Retained
- Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule B 7771
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6732
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- File Number 486
- Senate Calendar Number 271
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 10:00 AM
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/13
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendments (15)
+ − Vote
March 22, 2017: ENV Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor