+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act 14-97
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 493
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4678
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 7
- Senate Calendar Number 43
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/10/14 5:00 PM
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/18
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 7, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 286 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 147
- Absent: 4
May 1, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 256 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 4678
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 2
May 1, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 258 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (46)
Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor