+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Act 21-35
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 9677
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 9649
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 516
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8695
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8687
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- File Number 481
- Senate Calendar Number 295
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/21 5:00 PM
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/17
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On January 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor