+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- File Number 708
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/28/14 5:00 PM
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 245
- File Number 366
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/18
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce