+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (38)
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Act 19-25
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 10335
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 655
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9302
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 9371
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended and Transmitted
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Senate Calendar Number 36
- File Number 35
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/19 5:00 PM
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 02/14
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor