+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Adopted, Senate
On May 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 532
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 5, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- Adopted, House
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- File Number 544
- House Calendar Number 370
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 5:00 PM
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/26
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Vote
April 3, 2018: JUD Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor