+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, House Committee on Appropriations
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 230
- File Number 416
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- House Favorable
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/27
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with House Clerks 03/10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor