+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 307
- House Calendar Number 184
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/08
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
+ − Sponsors (2)
Transportation Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor