+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, House Committee on Judiciary
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 95
- File Number 142
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/14 5:00 PM
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- House Favorable
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with House Clerks 02/26
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor